IL HB3180 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that the State Pensions Fund shall be used for operational expenses of the Office of the State Treasurer. Removes requirements that the State Treasurer pay certain amounts to the Bank and Trust Company Fund, the Savings Bank Regulatory Fund, the Residential Finance Regulatory Fund, the Financial Institution Fund, and the Credit Union Fund for expenses incurred in complying with the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-PENSION FUND/TREASURER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 8.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |