IL HB3179 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies the term "qualified expenses" for the purpose of participant requirements in the use of the College Savings Pool established under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback