IL HB3178 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] |
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3178&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3178.htm |