IL HB3177 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes provisions providing the Secretary of State authority to cancel a license or permit of a person who has failed to pay fees owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission or has been convicted of a sex offense as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act. Removes a provision providing that the reporting requirements for public officials to the Secretary shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been ordered suspended. Provides that the Secretary may suspend or revoke the license or permit of someone who has been convicted of violating a provision in the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 relating to criminal trespass of vehicles if the violation involves operating the vehicle. Removes various provisions allowing the Secretary to suspend or revoke an individual's license or permit. Provides that a person who, based on the changes in the bill, becomes eligible for a driver's license, State identification card, or permit, may petition the Secretary for reinstatement of his or her license, identification card, or permit. Removes other provisions. Repeals Sections concerning suspension of a driver's license of a person convicted of theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LICENSE-SUSPENSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-01-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-01-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-704.2Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-201Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-204Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
62556-206Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-208.2Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-209Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
62556-308Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback