IL HB3174 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Further amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that "new wind power facility" includes the replacement of an existing electric generation facility, including the demolition and removal of an electric generation facility irrespective of whether it will be replaced. Provides that a new wind power facility shall be deemed to include any permanent structures associated with the electric generation facility. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGH IMPACT BUSINESS-WIND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0605 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Public Utilities Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |