IL HB3172 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that specified vehicles of the second division, medical transport vehicles, and vehicles designed to carry 15 or fewer passengers operated by a contract carrier transporting employees shall be subject to a safety test at an official testing station at least every 12 months (rather than 6 months). Provides that each school bus and each vehicle of the first division that is used for a purpose that requires a school bus driver permit shall be subject to a safety test at an official testing station at least every 12 months (rather than 6 months) or 10,000 miles, whichever occurs first.
Title
VEH CD-VEH SAFETY TEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0160 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-014-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |