IL HB3172 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that specified vehicles of the second division, medical transport vehicles, and vehicles designed to carry 15 or fewer passengers operated by a contract carrier transporting employees shall be subject to a safety test at an official testing station at least every 12 months (rather than 6 months). Provides that each school bus and each vehicle of the first division that is used for a purpose that requires a school bus driver permit shall be subject to a safety test at an official testing station at least every 12 months (rather than 6 months) or 10,000 miles, whichever occurs first.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VEH SAFETY TEST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-014-000
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625513-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback