IL HB3171 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Block Grants for Chicago Article of the School Code. Removes provisions that require the educational services block grant to include Special Education and funding for children requiring special education services. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHI BLOCK GRANT-SPEC ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-7.02b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1D-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3171&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3171.htm |