IL HB3168 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that every sentencing order shall include as though written therein a term providing that if the Department of Corrections accepts an eligible offender in the program and determines the offender has successfully completed the impact incarceration program, the sentence shall be reduced to time considered served. Removes the requirement that a person be recommended and approved for placement in the impact incarceration program in the court's sentencing order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-IMPACT INCARCERATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0105
2019-07-19HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-19HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-001-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-8-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback