IL HB3168 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. In a provision that requires the classification of all reports in the central register, provides that prior to classifying a report, the person making the classification shall determine whether the child named in the report is the subject of a juvenile delinquency action under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 with an open placement or intact family services case with the Department of Children and Family Services or the subject of an abuse, neglect, or dependent minor action under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. With regard to a report that the Department intends to classify as indicated, requires the Department to transmit a copy of the report with a written notice of the Department's intent to the child's attorney or appointed guardian ad litem within 45 days of the classification of the report. Sets forth similar notice requirements with regard to unfounded reports. Permits a person appointed under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 as the guardian ad litem of a minor who has an open placement or intact family services case and who is the subject of a report or records made pursuant to the Act to have access to certain records concerning reports of child abuse and neglect. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a guardian ad litem appointed under the Act for a minor with an open placement or intact family services case with the Department is entitled to receive copies of any and all classified reports of child abuse or neglect made pursuant to the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-INTACT FAMILY SRVCS CASES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-22HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-03-22HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-24HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325511.1Amended CodeCitation Text
32557.14Amended CodeCitation Text
32557.16Amended CodeCitation Text
32557.22Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-610Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback