IL HB3167 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to conduct and regularly update a study on the early childhood workforce at least once every 3 years. Provides that the study shall: (i) describe the professional development system for the early childhood workforce and characteristics of the workforce; (ii) determine compensation levels that are sufficient to attract, support, and retain a workforce of high-quality child care providers; (iii) make recommendations to help create an accessible and well-supported career advancement pathway and estimate the providers' costs of implementing training and professional development, including the compensation levels identified in item (ii); and (iv) describe how the Department can set provider payment rates sufficient to allow providers to achieve the compensation levels. Provides that the Department shall conduct the study required by carrying out a cost of quality study or survey that the Department is currently conducting, as a requirement of its State plan under a specified provision of the Child Care and Development Block Grant Act of 1990, and utilize the information to set base payment rates.
Title
DHS-CHILDHOOD WORKFORCE STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2017-10-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-047-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |