IL HB3166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Makes a technical change concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-03-23HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2039302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback