IL HB3165 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois and Michigan Canal Development Act. Removes, with respect to certain canal lands conveyed to the City of Ottawa, all restrictions imposed under certain laws and in the deed of conveyance.
Title
IM CANAL-UNDO DEED RESTRICTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0461 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 45 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |