IL HB3164 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance and renewal of a license to sell alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of specific places of worship or schools located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH/SCHOOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0036
2017-08-04HouseEffective Date August 4, 2017
2017-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-06HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-037-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-001-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-001-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback