IL HB3163 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that contributions to an ABLE account during the taxable year may be deducted from adjusted gross income as provided under a specified Section of the Illinois Income Tax Act. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In a Section concerning base income, provides that the adjusted gross income shall be modified by adding a maximum amount of, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, $10,000 contributed in the taxable year to an ABLE account under a specified Section of the State Treasurer Act. Provides for an exemption from a Section concerning the sunset of exemptions, credits, and deductions under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURY-ABLE ACCOUNT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-08-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-08-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-08-14HouseArrived in House
2017-08-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2017-08-13Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-08-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-08-13SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2017-08-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
2017-08-13SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-08-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-08-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-08-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-08-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-13SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 14, 2017
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-21HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-16HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.6Amended CodeCitation Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback