IL HB3153 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to place a locked suggestion box in each group home, shelter, and transitional living arrangement that accepts youth in care for placement by the Department. Requires the Department to submit a report to the General Assembly each year outlining the issues and concerns submitted to the locked suggestion box and the solution to each issue and concern.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-LOCKED SUGGESTION BOXES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2019-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2019-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-05-17SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050539.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback