IL HB3149 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Removes the provisions changing the definition of "qualified provider". In the provisions concerning installment payment contracts and lease purchase agreements, removes the amendatory language relating to proprietary information or practices. Prohibits guaranteed energy savings contracts from being entered into on or after January 1, 2026 (rather than on or after January 1, 2021). Removes the provisions repealing the Article.
Title
SCH CD-ENERGY CONSERVATION
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 19b-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |