IL HB3148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Building Code Violation Notice Posting Act. Provides that a municipality, township, or county that has a building code shall, in addition to any other notice required by law, post a notice containing a large red "X", of not less than 2 feet by 2 feet in size, conspicuously on the front of any building or structure the designated building code enforcement officer has determined to be a dilapidated structure. Provides that a police officer or fire fighter who, while in the performance of his or her duties, determines that a building or structure is a dilapidated structure, he or she shall post a red "X" on the building or structure and immediately notify the designated building code enforcement officer. Requires the building code enforcement officer to examine the building or structure within 24 hours after receiving notice and determine if the building is dilapidated and whether the "X" should remain. Limits home rule powers.
Title
DILAPIDATED STRUCTURES-NOTICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 810 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 810 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3148&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3148.htm |