IL HB3143 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. In the definition of "goods or services furnished to the State", includes services concerning prevention, intervention, or treatment services and supports for youth provided by a vendor by virtue of a contractual grant agreement. In the definition of "proper bill or invoice", includes invoices issued under a contractual grant agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROMPT PAYMENT-GRANT AGREEMNTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-020-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-002-000
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-046-000
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback