IL HB3142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Criminal History in College Applications Act. Provides that a public college may not inquire about or consider an applicant's criminal history information at any time during the admission decision-making process, except as required by State or federal law. Allows public colleges to continue using a multi-institution application, even if the application inquires about criminal history, but requires the public college to disregard the information for the admissions process. Allows public colleges to inquire about criminal history for certain purposes after the admission decision-making process, but forbids public colleges from rescinding an admissions offer based on the information. Authorizes public colleges to provide certain information. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM HISTORY IN COLLEGE APPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-004-001 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-004-001 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |