IL HB3141 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall establish a maximum acceptable Global Warming Potential (GWP) standard for State purchases of vehicles, appliances, and building materials for use in State-funded infrastructure projects.
Title
GLOBAL WARMING POTENTIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-039-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 019-009-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 019-009-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-008-000 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |