IL HB3139 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, every school district, charter school, or alternative school or any school receiving public funds shall collect and review its chronic absence data and determine what systems of support and resources are needed to engage chronically absent students and their families to encourage the habit of daily attendance and promote success. Provides that school districts, charter schools, or alternative schools or any school receiving public funds shall provide a system of support to students who are at risk of reaching or exceeding chronic absence levels with strategies such as those available through the Illinois Multi-tiered Systems of Support Network. Requires schools to make resources available to support and engage students. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SCH CD-CHRONIC ABSENT PUPILS
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0156 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-001 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |