IL HB3139 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on November 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-06 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on November 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-06 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may demonstrate proof of insurance by means of a mobile electronic device. Provides that the officer being provided proof of insurance via mobile electronic device may not view any other contents of the mobile electronic device. Provides that the owner of a mobile electronic device surrendered in this manner assumes all responsibility for damage to the device.
Title
MOBILE INSURANCE VERIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-06 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2013-10-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 7-602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |