IL HB3133 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Township Modernization and Consolidation Act. Provides that all townships in a county may be dissolved by referendum, through either citizen petition or county board ordinance. Provides for petition, ordinance, and notice requirements. Provides for transfer of property, assets, personnel, contractual obligations, liabilities, tax levies, records, and rights and duties from the township to county. Further provides for procedures the county board may employ if a township has outstanding debt on the date of dissolution of the township. Amends the Township Code. Abolishes of office of township collector and transfers all powers and duties to the county collector. Provides that counties who dissolve all townships may retain their current form of governance (currently, required to form a commission form). Further provides that all townships within a coterminous municipality may dissolve (currently, only selected townships may). Amends the Election Code, Public Funds Statement Publication Act, the Property Tax Code, Mobile Home Local Services Tax Enforcement Act, and Counties Code making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOWNSHIP CONSOLIDATION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10528-7Amended CodeCitation Text
30153aAmended CodeCitation Text
352001-151New CodeSee Bill Text
352003-70Amended CodeCitation Text
35516320Amended CodeCitation Text
5552-4006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1005Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-32028Amended CodeCitation Text
555Div. 2-4 headingAmended CodeCitation Text
601235-20Amended CodeCitation Text
60125-15Amended CodeCitation Text
60125-25Amended CodeCitation Text
60127-10Amended CodeCitation Text
60127-15Amended CodeCitation Text
60127-5Amended CodeCitation Text
60178-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60178-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
601Art. 27 headingAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback