IL HB3131 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that if in any levy year (1) the tax rate for the sum of all of the funds that are included in a taxing district's aggregate levy exceeds the district's tax rate for those funds in the previous levy year, and (2) the district is not otherwise required to hold a Truth in Taxation hearing, then the corporate authorities of the taxing district must approve, by ordinance or resolution, the total tax rate and hold a public hearing. Contains provisions concerning notice. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-INCREASED RATE
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3131&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3131.htm |