IL HB3130 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pesticide Act. Changes the product registration fee to $600 per 2-year registration period (currently, $300 per product per year). Changes the business registration fee to $800 per 2-year registration period (currently, $400 per year). Changes the penalty for late registration to $100 per product in addition to the regular product registration fee (currently, $400 per product in lieu of the normal registration fee). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PESTICIDE REGISTRATION FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0115
2017-08-15HouseEffective Date August 15, 2017
2017-08-15HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4156012Amended CodeCitation Text
415606Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback