IL HB3126 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals language making certain provisions for reassignment by dealers applicable to salvage certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH-CD-SALVAGE CERTIFICATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0042
2023-06-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2024
2023-06-09HouseGovernor Approved
2023-06-02HouseSent to the Governor
2023-05-04HousePassed Both Houses
2023-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2023-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
2023-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2023-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
2023-04-12SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-03-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2023-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2023-03-23SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2023-03-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2023-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-118Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback