IL HB3125 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that paper or electronic return receipts issued by the United States Postal Service constitute proof of service.
Title
UNEMPLOY INS-SERVICE-RECEIPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0107 |
2013-07-23 | House | Effective Date July 23, 2013 |
2013-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Forby |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Labor and Commerce; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Labor and Commerce; 014-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-000-000 |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-008-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |