IL HB3122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who holds elected office, except for a member of the governing body of a city, village, incorporated town, or township, shall not be considered a participating employee, unless (1) the person has elected to become a participating employee; (2) the governing body has filed a resolution certifying that a person in that position is expected to work more than 600 hours (or 1,000 hours in a participating municipality that has adopted a specified resolution); and (3) the person has submitted logs evidencing that he or she has met the hourly standard. Requires the resolution to be adopted and filed with the Fund no more than 90 days after each general election. Contains provisions specifying the manner of documenting and submitting the time spent on official government business. Provides that an affected official who fails to submit time sheets or fails to conduct official government business to fulfill the hourly requirement with respect to that position shall not be permitted to continue participation in the Fund as an affected official. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-IMRF-OFFICE HOLDERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0274
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-137Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-137.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback