IL HB3114 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Changes the definition of "supervisor". Provides that, in police units, if employees consist of sworn officers serving as shift commander or below, each shift commander, regardless of sworn rank, is a "supervisor" if he or she is responsible for several police officers, one or more units or teams, or an entire shift. Provides that, if there is no sworn rank between that of chief or sheriff and the highest ranked sworn shift commander, the employer may designate a single exempt shift commander position on each shift as a "supervisor". Specifies that each sworn or exempt rank above that of a designated exempt shift commander is a "supervisor".
Title
SUPERVISOR LABOR RELATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-002-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |