IL HB3114 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to create a pilot program to allow petition signatures to be gathered electronically. Provides that a statement of candidacy shall include a space for a candidate to include his or her telephone number and email address. Provides that a candidate's petition for countywide office in Cook County must contain at least 5,000 but not more than 10,000 signatures (rather than the number of signatures equal to .5% of the qualified electors of his or her party who cast votes at the last preceding general election in Cook County). Amends the Revised Cities and Villages Act of 1941. Provides that a petition for nomination for mayor of Chicago must be signed by at least 5,000 but not more than 10,000 legal voters of the city (rather than 12,500).
Title
ELEC CODE-PETITIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 7-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 20 | 21-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |