IL HB3110 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Social Services Contract Notice Act. Provides that the Act applies only to non-governmental service providers who deliver social services designed to ensure the health, safety, education, or welfare of Illinois residents on behalf of the State through grants, contracts, or agreements with State agencies; and applies regardless of the source of the funds with which the grants, contracts, or agreements are paid, including federal assistance moneys. Provides that the Act does not apply to: (i) grants, contracts, or agreements with State agencies for the primary purpose of delivering or producing goods on behalf of the State; (ii) contracts between the State and its political subdivisions or other governments or between State governmental bodies; or (iii) modifications to contractor payment by the State resulting from the generally accepted accounting principles (GAAP) reconciliation process, the Illinois Grant Funds Recovery Act, or the service provider's underutilization of contract value, as determined by the State. Provides that any contract between a State agency and an authorized service provider may be terminated, suspended, or reduced by either party to the contract upon 30 days prior written notice. Permits the State to immediately terminate a contract for social services if the authorized service provider has made material misrepresentations or material omissions explicitly prohibited under State contracting requirements. Provides that the provision applies to agreements or contracts executed on or after the effective date of the Act. Requires State agencies to notify the Governor and other specified persons in writing of their intention to suspend, terminate, or reduce one or more contracts for social services. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL SRVCS CONTRACT NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback