IL HB3108 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that an election authority shall notify all qualified voters not more than 90 days nor less than 45 days before a general election (rather than a general or consolidated election) of the option for permanent vote by mail status using specified language. Provides an exception to the requirement to notify all qualified voters for voters who have applied for permanent vote by mail status under specified provisions or voters who submit a written request to be excluded from the permanent vote by mail status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-VOTE BY MAIL NOTICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Ethics & Elections
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-2.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback