IL HB3106 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, an individual who is 16 or 17 years of age may register to vote, with the registration held in abeyance by the appropriate election authority until that individual attains the required age to vote. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-PRE-REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1054-8.5Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-8.5Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-35.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback