IL HB3101 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lodging Establishment Human Trafficking Recognition Training Act. Requires hotels and motels to train employees in the recognition of human trafficking and protocols for reporting observed human trafficking to the appropriate authority. Provides that the Department of Labor shall develop the curriculum for the training. Requires the training program to be developed by January 1, 2020 and training by hotels and motels to begin by June 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN TRAFFICKING TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000
2019-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3101&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3101.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3101eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3101enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0499.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3101ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3101sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3101_04032019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3101_05172019_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3101sam001_05302019_028000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback