IL HB3096 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates the Lincoln-Douglas Historic Tax Credit. Provides that a taxpayer is entitled to a credit of up to 25% of the qualified expenditures incurred by the taxpayer for a qualified rehabilitation of a historic structure located in a Lincoln-Douglas debate community. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-LINCOLN DOUGLAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355224New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback