IL HB3096 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Authorizes the board of education of a school district, by resolution, to initiate an advisory question under the Code to be placed on the ballot both in the territory of the school district and in the precincts adjacent to the boundaries of the school district.
Title
ELECTION-ADVISORY-SCHOOL DIST
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Election Law |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000 |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |