IL HB3095 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Taxation Disclosure Act. Provides that each retailer that is required to collect and remit the tax imposed under the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act shall, in addition to other information included on the customer's receipt, include itemized line items on the customer's receipt detailing the use and occupation taxes imposed by each unit of local government.
Title
ITEMIZED RECEIPT-USE/OCC TAXES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2530 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3095&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3095.htm |