IL HB3095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that a person who has been honorably discharged who served in a combat mission by proof of hostile fire pay or imminent danger pay during deployment on active duty or has at least 4 years of full active and continuous military duty and received an honorable discharge before hiring is deemed to have met the collegiate educational requirements for an appointment of a Department of State Police officer. Provides that any person seeking a promotion to the rank of Sergeant and above shall meet the Department's educational requirements. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
STATE POLICE-EDUCATION REQUIRE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0011 |
2017-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |