IL HB3095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that a person who has been honorably discharged who served in a combat mission by proof of hostile fire pay or imminent danger pay during deployment on active duty or has at least 4 years of full active and continuous military duty and received an honorable discharge before hiring is deemed to have met the collegiate educational requirements for an appointment of a Department of State Police officer. Provides that any person seeking a promotion to the rank of Sergeant and above shall meet the Department's educational requirements. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-EDUCATION REQUIRE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0011
2017-06-30HouseEffective Date July 1, 2017
2017-06-30HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback