IL HB3093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Defines "hunting license" as an electronic or physical license authorizing the person to take a certain type of animal during a specified period of time. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-HUNTING LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0150
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52051.2k-1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback