IL HB3090 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Environmental Justice Act. Creates the Illinois Environmental Justice Advisory Council to provide independent advice and recommendations to the Governor, the Environmental Protection Agency, and the other State agencies about broad, cross-cutting issues related to environmental justice and on policies, practices, and specific actions. Requires the Agency to: (1) develop and implement a strategy prioritizing enforcement in neighborhoods with environmental justice populations; (2) compile an annual report detailing the number and types of enforcement actions in neighborhoods with environmental justice populations; (3) establish and maintain a supplemental environmental project bank with specified requirements; (4) publish a progress report on environmental justice no less often than every 5 years; and (5) work with the Department of Public Health to establish health risk assessment guidelines and develop an online mapping tool that identifies specified information. Contains requirements for environmental impact reports. Requires the Director of the Agency to appoint a Director of Environmental Justice within the Agency to perform specified duties. Provides that State agencies shall (1) designate an environmental justice coordinator for each State agency to perform specified actions and (2) develop a specific policy or strategy to promote environmental justice. Establishes the Interagency Environmental Justice Working Group to maximize State resources, research, and technical assistance to further the purposes of the Act and of environmental justice in the State. Provides that environmental justice coordinators shall serve as their State agency's representative to the Interagency Environmental Working Group. Contains other provisions.
Title
ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-01-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-011-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |