IL HB3090 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Reporting of Deaths in Custody Act. Provides that in any case in which a person dies while in the custody of: (1) any law enforcement agency, (2) a local or State correctional facility in the State, or (3) a peace officer or as a result of the peace officer's use of force, the law enforcement agency shall investigate and report the death in writing to the Attorney General, no later than 30 days after the date on which the person in custody or incarcerated died. Provides information that must be contained in the report. Provides that the report shall be a public record under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Attorney General shall issue a public annual report tabulating and evaluating trends and information on deaths in custody. Provides that the family, next of kin, or any other person reasonably nominated by the decedent as an emergency contact shall be notified as soon as possible in a suitable manner giving an accurate factual account of the cause of death and circumstances surrounding the death in custody. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Unified Code of Corrections concerning reports the Secretary of State, Department of Juvenile Justice, and the Department of Corrections shall make to the General Assembly. Provides that the Secretary of State, Department of Juvenile Justice, and the Department of Corrections shall publish the reports on their respective websites.
Title
REPORTING PRISONER DEATHS
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |