IL HB3086 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the Emotional Intelligence and Social and Emotional Learning Task Force, provides that the curriculum and assessment guidelines and best practices on emotional intelligence and social and emotional learning that the Task Force must develop must include strategies and instruction to address the needs of students with anger management issues. Provides that the Task Force must also make recommendations on the funding of appropriate services and the availability of sources of funding, including, but not limited to, federal funding, to address social and emotional learning. Requires the Task Force to complete the guidelines and recommendations on or before March 1, 2020 (rather than January 1, 2019).
Title
SCH CD-ANGER MANAGEMENT CLASS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0498 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Belt |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-039-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |