IL HB3084 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that each regional office of the Department may hire an individual to serve as Citizen Services Coordinator. Provides that each Citizen Services Coordinator shall assist citizens in the region in seeking out and obtaining State services and shall monitor citizen inquiries to determine which services are most in demand in the region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-SERVICES COORDINATOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0497
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1025New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback