IL HB3084 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the penalties for driving or being in actual physical control of a motor vehicle on any highway of this State at a time when the person's driver's license, permit or privilege to do so or the privilege to obtain a driver's license or permit is revoked or suspended because of a violation of the reckless homicide statute also applies to aggravated driving under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, or intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof when the violation was a proximate cause of the death of another person. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for aggravated driving under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, or intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof when the violation was a proximate cause of the death of another person may be commenced at any time.
Title
AGG DUI-DEATH-LIMITATION
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0149 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |