IL HB3080 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a gang-related activity, as defined by the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act, is a sufficient basis to terminate a lessee's lease. Provides a procedure and standards for a person who resides, works, or owns property in a building, or a neighbor within a 2-block radius of the building, to report that a tenant in the building is using a leased premises in gang-related activity. Provides that a person reporting the gang-related activity may give notice of the activity and demand that the landlord commence an investigation and, if warranted, a forcible entry and detainer action. Provides that if the landlord, after receipt of a notice and demand, refuses to investigate or finds no gang-related activity, the person who issued the notice and demand may petition the court to determine if the tenant allowed gang-related activity to occur at the leased premises, and if so, to order the tenant to vacate the premises. Provides remedies to the prevailing party in an action initiated under the new provisions by a person other than the landlord.
Title
CIV PRO-END LEASE-GANG ACTIVTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-120.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3080&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3080.htm |