IL HB3074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, Drug Asset Forfeiture Act, and the Narcotics Profit Forfeiture Act. Provides in provisions pertaining to forfeiture proceedings that the court shall admit a signed statement by a person who is 65 years old or older to demonstrate that the conveyance or other property was used without his or her consent. Provides that a claimant may file a temporary restraining order against the person who used his or her property without his or her consent under the Code of Civil Procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORFEITURE-OWNER STATEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateRe-assigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720528-5Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720547-15Amended CodeCitation Text
7251509Amended CodeCitation Text
7251755Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-160Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback