IL HB3072 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall reimburse a county up to $50 for an amount paid to an election judge under specified provisions that is in excess of $100 per day. Provides that the provisions shall not affect the calculation of an election judge's compensation.
Title
ELECTIONS-JUDGE COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3072&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3072.htm |