IL HB3072 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in a provision concerning vehicle protection products. Amends the definition of "vehicle protection product" by including protective chemicals and substances and excluding fuel additives, oil additives, or other chemical products applied to the engine, transmission, or fuel system of a motor vehicle. Provides that no vehicle protection products sold or offered for sale in the State shall be subject to the provisions of the Code or the Service Contract Act unless offered as a service contract under the terms of the Service Contract Act. Amends the Service Contract Act. In provisions concerning the definition of "service contract", makes changes concerning service contract coverage related to protective chemicals, substances, devices, or systems. Establishes requirements for refunds of vehicle protection products. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-VEH PROTECTION PRODUCT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Insurance; 013-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-05-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21515235Amended CodeCitation Text
2151525Amended CodeCitation Text
2155155.39Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback